Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Representatives Andraca and Pronschinske added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senator Quinn added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Introduced |