Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1) | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 06/26/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Representative Macco added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Senator Marklein added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Introduced |