Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 08/17/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 07/03/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Representatives O'Connor and Emerson added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Introduced |