Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Published 2-21-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 2-20-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 95
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 2-13-2024 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|