House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on State Affairs and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|