Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Introduced |