Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senators Wanggaard and Carpenter added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Representative Drake added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/24/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/10/2023 | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 08/09/2023 | Introduced |