Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 09/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 08/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 08/23/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 08/11/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 08/11/2023 | Introduced |