Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Representatives Mursau and Andraca added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Representative Moses added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/30/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/25/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 08/25/2023 | Introduced |