Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Introduced |