Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Published 3-9-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-8-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 105
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-4-2024 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator LeMahieu
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Recalled fron enrolling pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 113
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:17 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 27, Noes 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Knodl
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|