Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Representative Donovan added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Introduced |