House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 11:31 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Representative J. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|