Senate | 11/17/2023 | Published 11-17-2023 | ||
Senate | 11/17/2023 | Report approved by the Governor on 11-16-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 39 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2023 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Read | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 11/03/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Introduced |