Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/27/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Representatives J. Anderson and Brandtjen added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Introduced |