Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Senator Roys added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representatives Emerson, Clancy, Madison, Andraca and Conley added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Representatives Joers and Stubbs added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Introduced |