Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Published 3-28-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 227
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 94, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Bare added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Representatives Plumer, Conley and Joers added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Representative Melotik added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/31/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/27/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|