Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |