Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |