Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 12/04/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/30/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |