Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Representative Ohnstad withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Senator L. Johnson withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senator L. Johnson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Introduced |