Senate | 03/29/2024 | Published 3-30-2024 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 252 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024 | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a third time and concurred in | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:27 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 9 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Introduced |