Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Published 8-5-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 8-4-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 27
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Representative Madison added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|