House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Introduced |