Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Published 3-28-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 229
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
LRB correction (Senate Amendment 3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:29 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 3 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|