Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Introduced |