Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |