Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Published 3-21-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-20-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 122
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:34 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 1-16-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Utilities and Technology, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/28/2023
|
Representative Green added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|