Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Introduced |