Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 254
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 24, Noes 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Wimberger
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wimberger
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|