Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senator Agard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Introduced |