Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Senator Smith added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Billings added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Testin added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Representative Considine added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|