Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Representative Macco added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Introduced |