Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Introduced |