Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Published 2-22-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 2-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 96
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 2-19-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|