Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance and Small Business, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced |