House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|