Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB955 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 16, 2024 	Contact: Amber Otis, Senior Staff Attorney 
2023 Senate Bill 955 Senate Amendment 1  
2023 SENATE BILL 955 
Senate Bill 955 authorizes 14.2 full-time equivalent (FTE) positions for the Department of Justice (DOJ) 
Office of School Safety for the period from January 1, 2025 until September 30, 2025. The bill also 
authorizes a DOJ appropriation supported by fees charged for firearm purchase background checks and 
licenses to carry a concealed weapon to be used for purposes of the Office of School Safety.  
Additionally, the bill makes changes to provisions limiting how DOJ establishes the fee amount for 
licenses to carry a concealed weapon. Current law authorizes DOJ to determine a license amount equal 
to the cost of issuing the license, which cannot exceed $37, and requires DOJ to use a five-year planning 
period for determining the cost of issuing a license. The bill eliminates the requirement for the license 
fee to equal the cost of issuance and the five-year planning period. 
SENATE AMENDMENT 1 
Senate Amendment 1 maintains current law regarding the fee amount for licenses to carry concealed 
weapons, which limits the fee to the cost of issuing a license and requires a five-year planning period. 
The amendment authorizes 14.2 FTE positions for the Office of School Safety from January 1, 2025 to 
October 1, 2025 (rather than September 30).  
Finally, the amendment sunsets authorization for the DOJ appropriation funded by firearms 
background checks and concealed weapons license fees to be used for the Office of School Safety. As of 
October 1, 2025, the appropriation can no longer be used for this purpose. 
BILL HISTORY 
Senator Wanggaard offered Senate Amendment 1 on February 9, 2024. On February 15, 2024, the 
Senate Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety recommended adoption of the amendment, and 
passage of the bill, as amended, on votes of Ayes, 7; Noes, 0. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
AO:ksm