Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Introduced |