House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 11/03/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senator James added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Introduced |