Senate | 05/11/2023 | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 1-19-2023 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | Concurred in, Ayes 99, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | Read | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 01/03/2023 | Adopted, Ayes 26, Noes 6 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2023 | Considered as privileged and taken up | ||
Senate | 01/03/2023 | Introduced |