Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Laid on table | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Representatives Kitchens and Vining added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Representatives Joers and Jacobson added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Introduced |