1 | 1 | | LRB-5876/1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | CMH:klm |
---|
3 | 3 | | 2023 - 2024 LEGISLATURE |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2023 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTIO N 123 |
---|
5 | 5 | | February 19, 2024 - Introduced by Senators TESTIN, BALLWEG, CARPENTER, COWLES, |
---|
6 | 6 | | MARKLEIN, NASS, SPREITZER, WANGGAARD and WIRCH, cosponsored by |
---|
7 | 7 | | Representatives GUNDRUM, C. ANDERSON, ARMSTRONG, BARE, BEHNKE, |
---|
8 | 8 | | BINSFELD, CALLAHAN, DITTRICH, DONOVAN, DRAKE, DUCHOW, EDMING, |
---|
9 | 9 | | GUSTAFSON, JACOBSON, JOERS, KRUG, MAGNAFICI, MAXEY, MOORE OMOKUNDE, |
---|
10 | 10 | | NOVAK, O'CONNOR, OHNSTAD, ORTIZ-VELEZ, PETRYK, RATCLIFF, RETTINGER, |
---|
11 | 11 | | ROZAR, TITTL, SCHMIDT, SCHRAA, SHANKLAND, SINICKI, SORTWELL, SPIROS, |
---|
12 | 12 | | TUSLER, WITTKE and VANDERMEER. Referred to Committee on Senate |
---|
13 | 13 | | Organization. |
---|
14 | 14 | | ***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE*** |
---|
15 | 15 | | Relating to: commemorating the 80th anniversary of D-Day. |
---|
16 | 16 | | Whereas, on September 1, 1939, Germany declared war on Poland and started |
---|
17 | 17 | | the Second World War; and |
---|
18 | 18 | | Whereas, France surrendered on June 25, 1940, and was occupied by the Axis |
---|
19 | 19 | | countries of Germany and Italy; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | Whereas, the United States entered the war following the Japanese attack at |
---|
21 | 21 | | Pearl Harbor on December 7, 1941; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | Whereas, at the Trident Conference in May 1943, American President Franklin |
---|
23 | 23 | | D. Roosevelt and British Prime Minister Winston Churchill decided an Allied |
---|
24 | 24 | | invasion of German-occupied France would take place in 1944; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | Whereas, more than 150,000 soldiers and 190,000 naval personnel participated |
---|
26 | 26 | | in airborne operations and the amphibious landings at beaches along the Normandy |
---|
27 | 27 | | coastline code-named Omaha, Utah, Gold, Juno, and Sword; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | Whereas, American, British, Canadian, Free French, and Free Polish divisions |
---|
29 | 29 | | participated in the invasion, which commenced June 6, 1944; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | 1 |
---|
31 | 31 | | 2 |
---|
32 | 32 | | 3 |
---|
33 | 33 | | 4 |
---|
34 | 34 | | 5 |
---|
35 | 35 | | 6 |
---|
36 | 36 | | 7 |
---|
37 | 37 | | 8 |
---|
38 | 38 | | 9 |
---|
39 | 39 | | 10 |
---|
40 | 40 | | 11 |
---|
41 | 41 | | 12 |
---|
42 | 42 | | 13 |
---|
43 | 43 | | 14 |
---|
44 | 44 | | 15 - 2 - |
---|
45 | 45 | | LRB-5876/1 |
---|
46 | 46 | | CMH:klm |
---|
47 | 47 | | 2023 - 2024 Legislature |
---|
48 | 48 | | Whereas, Allied forces received additional support from the French Resistance; |
---|
49 | 49 | | and |
---|
50 | 50 | | Whereas, more than 9,000 Allied troops were killed or wounded during the first |
---|
51 | 51 | | 24 hours of the invasion; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | Whereas, the Normandy landings were the beginning of the liberation of |
---|
53 | 53 | | Western Europe from Axis control; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | Whereas, the French capital of Paris was liberated from German control on |
---|
55 | 55 | | August 25, 1944; now, therefore, be it |
---|
56 | 56 | | Resolved by the senate, the assembly concurring, That the members of the |
---|
57 | 57 | | Wisconsin Legislature solemnly recognize June 6, 2024, as the 80th anniversary of |
---|
58 | 58 | | the D-Day invasion and pay tribute to the millions of American and other Allied |
---|
59 | 59 | | troops who served honorably during the Second World War. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (END) |
---|
61 | 61 | | 1 |
---|
62 | 62 | | 2 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 3 |
---|
64 | 64 | | 4 |
---|
65 | 65 | | 5 |
---|
66 | 66 | | 6 |
---|
67 | 67 | | 7 |
---|
68 | 68 | | 8 |
---|
69 | 69 | | 9 |
---|
70 | 70 | | 10 |
---|
71 | 71 | | 11 |
---|
72 | 72 | | 12 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 13 |
---|