Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR123 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/19/2024

                            LRB-5876/1
CMH:klm
2023 - 2024  LEGISLATURE  
2023 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTIO N 123
February 19, 2024 - Introduced by Senators TESTIN, BALLWEG, CARPENTER, COWLES,
MARKLEIN, NASS, SPREITZER, WANGGAARD and WIRCH, cosponsored by
Representatives GUNDRUM, C. ANDERSON, ARMSTRONG, BARE, BEHNKE,
BINSFELD, CALLAHAN, DITTRICH, DONOVAN, DRAKE, DUCHOW, EDMING,
GUSTAFSON, JACOBSON, JOERS, KRUG, MAGNAFICI, MAXEY, MOORE OMOKUNDE,
NOVAK, O'CONNOR, OHNSTAD, ORTIZ-VELEZ, PETRYK, RATCLIFF, RETTINGER,
ROZAR, TITTL, SCHMIDT, SCHRAA, SHANKLAND, SINICKI, SORTWELL, SPIROS,
TUSLER, WITTKE and VANDERMEER. Referred to Committee on Senate
Organization.
***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
Relating to: commemorating the 80th anniversary of D-Day.
Whereas, on September 1, 1939, Germany declared war on Poland and started
the Second World War; and
Whereas, France surrendered on June 25, 1940, and was occupied by the Axis
countries of Germany and Italy; and
Whereas, the United States entered the war following the Japanese attack at
Pearl Harbor on December 7, 1941; and
Whereas, at the Trident Conference in May 1943, American President Franklin
D. Roosevelt and British Prime Minister Winston Churchill decided an Allied
invasion of German-occupied France would take place in 1944; and
Whereas, more than 150,000 soldiers and 190,000 naval personnel participated
in airborne operations and the amphibious landings at beaches along the Normandy
coastline code-named Omaha, Utah, Gold, Juno, and Sword; and
Whereas, American, British, Canadian, Free French, and Free Polish divisions
participated in the invasion, which commenced June 6, 1944; and
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15 - 2 -
LRB-5876/1
CMH:klm
2023 - 2024  Legislature
Whereas, Allied forces received additional support from the French Resistance;
and
Whereas, more than 9,000 Allied troops were killed or wounded during the first
24 hours of the invasion; and
Whereas, the Normandy landings were the beginning of the liberation of
Western Europe from Axis control; and
Whereas, the French capital of Paris was liberated from German control on
August 25, 1944; now, therefore, be it
Resolved by the senate, the assembly concurring, That the members of the
Wisconsin Legislature solemnly recognize June 6, 2024, as the 80th anniversary of
the D-Day invasion and pay tribute to the millions of American and other Allied
troops who served honorably during the Second World War.
(END)
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13