Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Introduced |