Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Representative Bare added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Introduced |