Senate | 10/13/2023 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Concurred in | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Referred to calendar of 10-12-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Introduced |