House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Introduced |