Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/27/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Laid on table | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Introduced |