Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Representative Armstrong added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Representative Schutt added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Representative Schmidt added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Introduced |